AR SB321 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notification that SB321 is now Act 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Definition Of A Collection Agency; And Concerning Appointments, Removal, And Vacancies Of The State Board Of Collection Agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Definition Of A Collection Agency; And Concerning Appointments, Removal, And Vacancies Of The State Board Of Collection Agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateNotification that SB321 is now Act 360
2023-03-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-16SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-16SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-03-16HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2023-03-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback