AR SB319 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Eminent Domain; And To Add New Definitions Under Eminent Domain.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Eminent Domain; And To Add New Definitions Under Eminent Domain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |