AR SB318 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that SB318 is now Act 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Manufactured Home Commission; And To Require Civil Penalties Assessed By The Arkansas Manufactured Home Commission To Be Established By Rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Manufactured Home Commission; And To Require Civil Penalties Assessed By The Arkansas Manufactured Home Commission To Be Established By Rule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateNotification that SB318 is now Act 391
2023-03-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-29SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-03-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-07SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-07SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback