AR SB316 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB316 is now Act 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Add The Contractors Licensing Board, Residential Contractors Committee, And The Department Of Labor And Licensing To The List Of Claimant Agencies For Purposes Of The Setoff Against State Tax Refunds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Add The Contractors Licensing Board, Residential Contractors Committee, And The Department Of Labor And Licensing To The List Of Claimant Agencies For Purposes Of The Setoff Against State Tax Refunds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateNotification that SB316 is now Act 625
2023-04-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-04-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-04-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-02-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback