AR SB316 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Notification that SB316 is now Act 466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow A Student In Grade Nine (9) To Earn Credit In A Course That Includes Personal And Family Finance Standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow A Student In Grade Nine (9) To Earn Credit In A Course That Includes Personal And Family Finance Standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateNotification that SB316 is now Act 466
2019-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback