AR SB312 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB312 is now Act 1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Ownership And Possession Of Real Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Ownership And Possession Of Real Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateNotification that SB312 is now Act 1046
2021-04-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1,2,3 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-26SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1,2,3
2021-04-22SenateRe-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2021-04-22SenateReturned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1, 2 and 3.
2021-04-22HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1, 2, & 3
2021-04-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-20HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2021-04-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-20HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-19HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-29HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2021-03-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-02-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2021-02-10SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb312&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB312/SB312021020211337.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB312/SB312030320211342.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB312/SB312032920211158.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB312/SB312041920211029.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB312/SB312042020211542.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1046.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB312-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB312-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB312-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB312-H3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB312&rcs=2174&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB312&rcs=3079&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB312&rcs=3150&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback