AR SB307 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notification that SB307 is now Act 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notification that SB307 is now Act 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Monument To The Unborn; To Create A Monument On State Capitol Grounds; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties Of The Secretary Of State.
Title
To Create A Monument To The Unborn; To Create A Monument On State Capitol Grounds; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties Of The Secretary Of State.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Sen. Tyler Dees [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Notification that SB307 is now Act 310 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-03-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed |