AR SB306 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB306 is now Act 638
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB306 is now Act 638
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting A Concealed Handgun Licensee To Carry A Concealed Handgun In A Municipally Owned Or Maintained Park.
Title
Permitting A Concealed Handgun Licensee To Carry A Concealed Handgun In A Municipally Owned Or Maintained Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Notification that SB306 is now Act 638 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |