AR SB302 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB302 is now Act 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Distribution Of The Penalty Assessed On Fraudulent Overpayments And Credited To The Unemployment Compensation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Distribution Of The Penalty Assessed On Fraudulent Overpayments And Credited To The Unemployment Compensation Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateNotification that SB302 is now Act 375
2019-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback