AR SB301 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB301 is now Act 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Laws Concerning Criminal Background Checks For Nursing Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Laws Concerning Criminal Background Checks For Nursing Licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateNotification that SB301 is now Act 626
2019-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-11SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-11HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback