AR SB300 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB300 is now Act 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modify The Date Of Retention Of The Stabilization Tax Set Aside Under The Department Of Workforce Services Law; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modify The Date Of Retention Of The Stabilization Tax Set Aside Under The Department Of Workforce Services Law; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateNotification that SB300 is now Act 454
2019-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-06SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-06SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 and 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-05SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-05HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2019-03-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-27HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback