AR SB3 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB3 is now Act 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Limit On School Choice Transfers Under The Public School Choice Act Of 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Limit On School Choice Transfers Under The Public School Choice Act Of 2015.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateNotification that SB3 is now Act 14
2018-03-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2018-03-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2018-03-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2018-03-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2018-03-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2018-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2018-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2018-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2018-03-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2018-03-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2018-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2018-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2018-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2018-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback