AR SB298 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB298 is now Act 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Taxable Wage Base Under The Department Of Workforce Services Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Taxable Wage Base Under The Department Of Workforce Services Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateNotification that SB298 is now Act 512
2019-03-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-14SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-14SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-03-06SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-06HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-27HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback