AR SB298 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB298 is now Act 1401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB298 is now Act 1401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Utilities Used By A Grain Drying And Storage Facility.
Title
To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Utilities Used By A Grain Drying And Storage Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB298 is now Act 1401 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Filed |