AR SB295 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Promote The Collection Of Labor Market Data; And To Require Employers To Participate In Surveys Conducted By The Bureau Of Labor Statistics Of The United States Department Of Labor.
Title
To Promote The Collection Of Labor Market Data; And To Require Employers To Participate In Surveys Conducted By The Bureau Of Labor Statistics Of The United States Department Of Labor.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |