AR SB290 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB290 is now Act 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB290 is now Act 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Type Of Annuity Contracts Subject To The Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act.
Title
To Clarify The Type Of Annuity Contracts Subject To The Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Notification that SB290 is now Act 368 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |