AR SB289 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB289 is now Act 462
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB289 is now Act 462
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Medical Ethics And Diversity Act.
Title
To Create The Medical Ethics And Diversity Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - The vote by which SB289 passed and was ordered enrolled was expunged (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - The vote by which SB289 passed and was ordered enrolled was expunged (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB289 is now Act 462 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The vote by which SB289 passed and was ordered enrolled was expunged. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-10 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed |