AR SB289 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB289 is now Act 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB289 is now Act 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise The Compensation Plan Under The Uniform Classification And Compensation Act And To Amend Various Laws Concerning Employees Of Institutions Of Higher Education And State Employee Salaries And Benefits.
Title
To Revise The Compensation Plan Under The Uniform Classification And Compensation Act And To Amend Various Laws Concerning Employees Of Institutions Of Higher Education And State Employee Salaries And Benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Charles Collins [R] | Rep. Mickey Gates [R] |
Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Rep. Roger Lynch [R] | Rep. Ron Mcnair [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Notification that SB289 is now Act 365 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-24 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-02-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |