AR SB282 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Returned by the Committee Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Consolidated Waterworks Systems; To Amend The General Powers Of A Public Body; And To Authorize Financing Improvements With Revenue Bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Consolidated Waterworks Systems; To Amend The General Powers Of A Public Body; And To Authorize Financing Improvements With Revenue Bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-10HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-10SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
2021-02-03SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback