AR SB280 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notification that SB280 is now Act 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Creation And Duties Of The Arkansas Ethics Commission; And To Amend Portions Of Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Creation And Duties Of The Arkansas Ethics Commission; And To Amend Portions Of Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateNotification that SB280 is now Act 307
2023-03-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-14SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-03-14HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2023-03-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-01SenateRules suspended.
2023-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-02-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback