AR SB274 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise The Circumstances Under Which A Public School Or Public School District That Has Been Taken Over By The State For Being In Academic Distress Can Be Returned To Local Control; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Revise The Circumstances Under Which A Public School Or Public School District That Has Been Taken Over By The State For Being In Academic Distress Can Be Returned To Local Control; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed |