AR SB271 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Notification that SB271 is now Act 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Add Human Trafficking To The Definitions Of Abuse And Sexual Abuse Within The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989 And Child Maltreatment Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Add Human Trafficking To The Definitions Of Abuse And Sexual Abuse Within The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989 And Child Maltreatment Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateNotification that SB271 is now Act 209
2017-02-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-02-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-02-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-02-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-02-17HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-02-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-13SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-09SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-02-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback