AR SB263 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB263 is now Act 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate The Attachment Of Signs To Utility Poles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate The Attachment Of Signs To Utility Poles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateNotification that SB263 is now Act 377
2021-03-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-10HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2021-02-23SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-23SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
2021-02-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb263&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB263/SB263020220211508.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB263/SB263022320210920.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB263/SB263030320211344.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=377.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB263-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB263-S2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB263&rcs=2171&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB263&rcs=2351&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback