AR SB263 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB263 is now Act 340
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB263 is now Act 340
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Reporting Requirements On Vendors Of Portable Electronics Insurance Policies; To Clarify The Requirements Of Insurers Regarding Changes To A Portable Electronics Insurance Policy.
Title
To Amend The Reporting Requirements On Vendors Of Portable Electronics Insurance Policies; To Clarify The Requirements Of Insurers Regarding Changes To A Portable Electronics Insurance Policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB263 is now Act 340 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2013-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |