AR SB260 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Notification that SB260 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Notification that SB260 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A Peer Review Program For Public Accountancy Licensees; And To Amend Provisions Concerning The Profession Of Public Accountancy.
Title
To Require A Peer Review Program For Public Accountancy Licensees; And To Amend Provisions Concerning The Profession Of Public Accountancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB260 is now Act 278 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-02-17 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed |