AR SB258 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB258 is now Act 879
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Increase The Penalty For Taking Campaign Funds As Personal Income; And To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Increase The Penalty For Taking Campaign Funds As Personal Income; And To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB258 is now Act 879
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-14SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-14SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback