AR SB256 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Use Of An Administrative Subpoena By The Division Of Arkansas State Police In An Investigation Concerning An Internet Crime Against A Minor.
Title
Concerning The Use Of An Administrative Subpoena By The Division Of Arkansas State Police In An Investigation Concerning An Internet Crime Against A Minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed |