AR SB254 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB254 is now Act 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Ensure That Businesses Are Not Penalized By The Department Of Health For The Behavior Of Their Patrons Or Customers During The Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Public Health Emergency; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Ensure That Businesses Are Not Penalized By The Department Of Health For The Behavior Of Their Patrons Or Customers During The Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Public Health Emergency; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateNotification that SB254 is now Act 401
2021-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-10SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-10HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-10HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-09SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-02-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-04SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb254&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB254/SB254020220211129.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB254/SB254020420210929.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=401.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB254-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB254&rcs=1940&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB254&rcs=2299&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB254&rcs=1945&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback