AR SB252 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Arkansas Economic Development Commission From Establishing Or Maintaining An Office In China.
Title
To Prohibit The Arkansas Economic Development Commission From Establishing Or Maintaining An Office In China.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-03-10 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |