AR SB252 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB252 is now Act 878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide For Insurance Coverage For Treatment Of Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection And Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide For Insurance Coverage For Treatment Of Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection And Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB252 is now Act 878
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-01SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-29HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback