AR SB243 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Amend The Department Of Career Education Public School Fund And The Skills Development Fund.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Amend The Department Of Career Education Public School Fund And The Skills Development Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB243 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SB243.pdf |