AR SB241 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Notification that SB241 is now Act 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of The Military Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of The Military Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateNotification that SB241 is now Act 229
2023-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-02-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-02-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-02-28HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2023-02-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-28HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2023-02-28HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2023-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2023-02-23HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-02-23SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-02-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2023-02-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback