AR SB24 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Notification that SB24 is now Act 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Defense Of A Person With The Use Of Physical Force Or Deadly Physical Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Defense Of A Person With The Use Of Physical Force Or Deadly Physical Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Motion to Suspend the Rules failed (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateNotification that SB24 is now Act 250
2021-02-25SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-02-25SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-02-24SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-02-24SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-02-24HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-02-24HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-01-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-01-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-01-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-01-13SenateMotion to Suspend the Rules failed
2021-01-13SenateMotion passed and roll call requested
2021-01-13SenateMotion to Suspend the Rules
2021-01-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-01-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2020-12-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb24&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB24/SB24122320200834.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB24/SB24011420211320.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=250.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB24-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB24&rcs=1741&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB24&rcs=1746&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB24&rcs=2087&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback