AR SB238 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Ineligibility For Certain Retirement Benefits Upon Conviction Of A Felony Arising Out Of An Elected Public Official's Official Actions; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide For Ineligibility For Certain Retirement Benefits Upon Conviction Of A Felony Arising Out Of An Elected Public Official's Official Actions; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB238 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB238.pdf |