AR SB236 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish A Small Business Retirement Program In Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish A Small Business Retirement Program In Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-03-16SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-16SenateRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-07SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-07SenateAmendment # 1 and #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 and #2.
2017-03-06SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2017-01-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs
2017-01-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback