AR SB235 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Notification that SB235 is now Act 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow School Employees To Act As Election Officials; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow School Employees To Act As Election Officials; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateNotification that SB235 is now Act 553
2019-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-25SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-20HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback