AR SB233 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that SB233 is now Act 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Notice Requirements For Certain Elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Notice Requirements For Certain Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - Returned To the Senate as passed. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateNotification that SB233 is now Act 473
2019-03-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-14SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-13HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback