AR SB232 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Freedom Of Contract In Higher Education Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Freedom Of Contract In Higher Education Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #1 Withdrawn
2019-02-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback