AR SB228 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Protect The Health And Safety Of Public School Students With Diabetes By Providing For Certain School Personnel To Be Trained In The Administration Of Glucagon.
Title
To Protect The Health And Safety Of Public School Students With Diabetes By Providing For Certain School Personnel To Be Trained In The Administration Of Glucagon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed |