AR SB22 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB22 is now Act 1516
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB22 is now Act 1516
2013-04-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-23SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-23SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-23HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-23HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-22SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-22SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-22SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-22SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-19SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-01-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback