AR SB219 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB219 is now Act 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB219 is now Act 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Enact The State Insurance Department's General Omnibus Bill.
Title
To Enact The State Insurance Department's General Omnibus Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB219 is now Act 231 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |