AR SB215 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB215 is now Act 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB215 is now Act 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Filing For A Municipal Office.
Title
Concerning The Filing For A Municipal Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB215 is now Act 1066 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The vote by which SB215 passed on Feb11 was expunged |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2013-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed |