AR SB212 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB212 is now Act 430
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Pans/pandas Advisory Council; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Pans/pandas Advisory Council; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateNotification that SB212 is now Act 430
2021-03-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-18SenateRules suspended.
2021-03-18SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2021-03-15SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-15SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2021-03-15HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-03-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-02-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-02-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-01-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2021-01-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb212&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB212/SB212012620211434.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB212/SB212031120210954.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=430.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB212-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB212&rcs=1860&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB212&rcs=2353&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB212&rcs=2382&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback