AR SB208 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB208 is now Act 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB208 is now Act 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Bank Commissioner To Conduct Examinations Of Technology Service Providers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Authorize The Bank Commissioner To Conduct Examinations Of Technology Service Providers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Notification that SB208 is now Act 646 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-20 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |