AR SB205 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that SB205 is now Act 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that SB205 is now Act 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Ethics And Campaign Finance; To Amend The Times For Certain Contribution And Expenditure Reports; And To Amend Portions Of Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Ethics And Campaign Finance; To Amend The Times For Certain Contribution And Expenditure Reports; And To Amend Portions Of Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Notification that SB205 is now Act 240 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-02-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |