AR SB204 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Notification that SB204 is now Act 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Internet Protocol Address Geolocation Information In An Emergency Situation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Internet Protocol Address Geolocation Information In An Emergency Situation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateNotification that SB204 is now Act 584
2019-03-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-26SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-26SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-26HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2019-03-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRe-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-30SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-01-30SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback