AR SB202 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that SB202 is now Act 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that SB202 is now Act 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Phillips Community College Of The University Of Arkansas Building Trades Construction Program.
Title
To Repeal The Phillips Community College Of The University Of Arkansas Building Trades Construction Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Returned To the Senate as passed. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Notification that SB202 is now Act 239 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |