AR SB200 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Notification that SB200 is now Act 275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Various Provisions Of Law Related To Tuition Benefits For Soldiers And Airmen Of The Arkansas National Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Various Provisions Of Law Related To Tuition Benefits For Soldiers And Airmen Of The Arkansas National Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateNotification that SB200 is now Act 275
2023-03-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-08SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-08SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-03-08HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-03-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-03-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback