AR SB2 | 2022 | 93rd General Assembly (Special)
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 60-3-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 60-3-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Education - School Safety Grants Appropriation And School Safety Set-aside Or Contingency Vote 3/5 Set-aside For The 2022-2023 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Education - School Safety Grants Appropriation And School Safety Set-aside Or Contingency Vote 3/5 Set-aside For The 2022-2023 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | Notification that SB2 is now Act 3 |
2022-08-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2022-08-11 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2022-08-11 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2022-08-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2022-08-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2022-08-10 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2022-08-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2022-08-10 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2022-08-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Filed |