AR SB2 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 80-28)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors

Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Sen. Alan Clark [R]Rep. Andy Mayberry [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]
Sen. Bryan King [R]Sen. Bill Sample [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Scott Baltz [D]
Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R]Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Charles Blake [D]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]
Sen. William Bond [D]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]
Rep. Charlotte Douglas [R]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]Rep. Sarah Capp [R]Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]
Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]Sen. Linda Collins-Smith [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Dan Douglas [R]
Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D]Rep. David Meeks [R]Sen. David Sanders [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]
Rep. David Whitaker [D]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Andy Davis [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]
Rep. Trevor Drown [R]Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D]Rep. Les Eaves [R]Sen. Joyce Elliott [D]
Rep. Fred Allen [D]Rep. Joe Farrer [R]Rep. David Fielding [D]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]
Rep. Jack Fortner [R]Rep. Grant Hodges [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]Rep. Mickey Gates [R]
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Jeremy Gillam [R]Rep. Kim Hammer [R]Rep. Kenneth Henderson [R]
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Mike Holcomb [D]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]
Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. John Cooper [R]Sen. Jane English [R]Sen. Jim Hendren [R]
Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R]Rep. Lane Jean [R]Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Ken Ferguson [D]
Rep. Kim Hendren [R]Sen. Keith Ingram [D]Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D]Sen. Lance Eads [R]
Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Greg Leding [D]Rep. Tim Lemons [R]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]
Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]Rep. Monte Hodges [D]Rep. Michael Gray [D]
Rep. John Maddox [R]Rep. Stephen Magie [D]Sen. Bruce Maloch [D]Rep. Mark McElroy [D]
Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. Reginald Murdock [D]Rep. Milton Nicks [D]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Clint Penzo [R]Rep. Rebecca Petty [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]
Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Rep. Chris Richey [D]Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]
Rep. Laurie Rushing [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]Rep. Warwick Sabin [D]
Rep. Jim Sorvillo [R]Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. James Sturch [R]Rep. Dan Sullivan [R]
Sen. Trent Garner [R]Sen. Larry Teague [D]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Rep. Clarke Tucker [D]
Sen. Uvalde Lindsey [D]Rep. Vivian Flowers [D]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. John Walker [D]
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateNotification that SB2 is now Act 3
2018-03-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2018-03-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2018-03-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2018-03-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2018-03-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2018-03-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2018-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2018-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2018-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2018-03-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2018-03-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2018-03-14SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2018-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2018-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2018-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2018-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback